Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/02/2017 at 10:47:46 (UTC).

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC vs. ANGELINA CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 07/31/2012 EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against ANGELINA CAMPOS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayes, Matt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1822

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hayes, Matt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

CAMPOS, ANGELINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dan G. Young

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2012
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt) ; Judgment of $1,872.01; Awarded To: EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC; Awarded Against: ANGELINA CAMPOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Default Notice Mailed: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Military Affidavit Filed: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Certificate of Last Known Address Filed: (Judicial Officer: Hayes, Matt )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Motion Filed: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • Prove Up Hearings: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2012
  • CANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hayes, Matt) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • Motion Granted: PER JUDGE 1 WEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • Request Made: BY PLTF ATTY TO BE RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Answer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CITATION: CAMPOS, ANGELINA: Served: 08/30/2012; Returned: 09/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP7-2012-05327: EZ MESSENGER: (31.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff EQUABLE ASCENT FINANCIAL LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 31.00; Total Payments and Credits: 31.00; Balance Due as of 03/02/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 31.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan G Young