This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/28/2022 at 06:37:32 (UTC).

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF WARREN JACKSON vs. HAWKINS NOADYAH

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 ENCOMPASS INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF WARREN JACKSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAWKINS NOADYAH. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5548

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENCOMPASS INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF WARREN JACKSON

P.O. Box 655441

Dallas, TX 75265

Defendant

NOADYAH, HAWKINS

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paula Loftis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: //TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-suit Without Prejudice// EFILED// W/ O PREJ// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CIT AND PETN TO PPS//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIM: EMAILED ALLSTATE//TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-03132: ENCOMPASS INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF WARREN JACKSON: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ENCOMPASS INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF WARREN JACKSON; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: diana.martinez@allstate.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Loftis, Paula