This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/26/2021 at 08:03:56 (UTC).

Elton Properties, LLC vs Karl Hernandes

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Elton Properties, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Karl Hernandes. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********57-3

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elton Properties, LLC

Defendant

Hernandes, Karl Also Known As Fernandes, Karl

Arlington, TX 76012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hani Francis Kobty

Defendant Attorney

Brent Schellhammer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Final After Non Jury Index # 7: copy interhouse enveloped to Jp ct 2 6/25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Considered appeal of denial of AIP. Reversed and found legal aid rep. allowed appeal. S Ord.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketHearing: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hrabal, Mike) : on Pauper's Affidavit Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketLetter of Confirmation of Hearing Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketLetter Requesting Setting for Trial Index # 5: Request for Court Date and Contest Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJP Motions & Orders Index # 3: / Denying Statement of Inability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketJP Notice of Appeal Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1: / Statement of Inability

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hani Francis Kobty