Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/03/2021 at 10:24:10 (UTC).

ELECTRA LINK, INC. vs. EQUINOX HOTEL ARLINGTON IGP

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 ELECTRA LINK, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EQUINOX HOTEL ARLINGTON IGP. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1550

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELECTRA LINK, INC.

Defendant

EQUINOX HOTEL ARLINGTON IGP

Bedford, TX 76021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Marie Lara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: TRANSFER FILING FEES HAVE NOT BEEN PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing Fees to be Paid Mailed to Plaintiff: SECOND NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff ELECTRA LINK, INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 46.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing Fees to be Paid Mailed to Plaintiff: MAILED TO PLTF ATTY: MEGAN M. LARA, 21755 INTERSTATE HWY 45, #10, SPRING, TX 77388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase Transferred from Another Court (OCA Opening): HARRIS COUNTY, TEXAS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electra Link Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lara, Megan M