Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/09/2019 at 08:08:09 (UTC).

Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc. d/b/a Lone Star Towing vs Ronnie Turner

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc d/b/a Lone Star Towing filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ronnie Turner. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********99-3

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc.

1100 Elaine Place

Fort Worth, TX 76106

d/b/a Lone Star Towing

1100 Elaine Place

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Defendant

Turner, Ronnie

Springtown, TX 76082

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roland P Schafer

Defendant Attorney

MARY MARGARET BLACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • Jury Fee Payment Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#5: With Discovery Requests

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4: Original Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Citation: PPS; Turner, Ronnie: Served: 09/06/2018; Returned: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#3: Re: Service Issuance Request (citation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-136695: Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc.: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-136612: Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc.: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-139632: Turner, Ronnie: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Financial Information: Defendant Turner, Ronnie; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Earl's Wrecker Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roland P Schafer