This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:16:45 (UTC).

Dixon at Stonegate vs Ronald D. Cunningham and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Dixon at Stonegate filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ronald D Cunningham and All Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********24-1

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dixon at Stonegate

2501 Oak Hill Circle

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Defendants

and All Occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Cunningham, Ronald D.

Fort Worth, TX 76109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#14: Writ of Posession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-154758: Dixon at Stonegate: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Dixon at Stonegate; Total Financial Assessment: 155.00; Total Payments and Credits: 155.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession - Post Judgment: PCT. 6,...QC by VS, 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketLetter Doc ID#13: Request for Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Doc ID#12: Copy electronically served and/or mailed to party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment After non Jury Trial; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Final After Non Jury Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Non jury trial. Defendant not appear. Paper Judgment Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Doc ID#8: and Request for Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Cunningham, Ronald D.; Total Financial Assessment: 254.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 254.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketLetter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketJP Judgment Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketJP Request Source of Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Doc ID#2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOCA Appeal Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIXON AT STONEGATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rodriguez