Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/15/2021 at 13:32:30 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Wanda L Delulio

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wanda L Delulio. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4787

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Delulio, Wanda L

Fort Worth, TX 76179-0811

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketHearing: (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketEmailed: pltf dismissal notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) ; Other; 10/13/2021; Reset by Court to 06/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketEmailed: 10 DAY LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket10 Day Letter Mailed to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: UNEXECUTED / ILLNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-3263: Discover Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Delulio, Wanda L: Returned Unserved 06/14/2021; Returned: 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan