This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/05/2021 at 08:09:28 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Thelma J Ramirez

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thelma J Ramirez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********42-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Discover Bank

a FDIC-insured Delaware State Bank

Defendant

Ramirez, Thelma J

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oluwatoyosi Josephine Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC LEGAL; Ramirez, Thelma J: Served: 10/28/2021; Returned: 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-176957: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a FDIC-insured Delaware State Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant