Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/16/2021 at 08:15:05 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Teresa A Dunn

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Teresa A Dunn. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********48-3

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Dunn, Teresa A

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Defendant Attorney

John A. Norman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 8: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 7: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171003: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/5/2021; Dunn, Teresa A: Served: 04/09/2021; Returned: 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORMAN, JOHN A