Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/16/2021 at 04:30:45 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Stacy Phillips

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stacy Phillips. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8722

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

6500 New Albany Road

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant

Phillips, Stacy

Fort Worth, TX 76120-1328

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) : 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//SERVD VIA ALT SERV//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO PPS/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: APROVE BOTH METHODS/APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: 1ST REQUEST/ EFILED/ EMAIL TO RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com //APG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-03066: Discover Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Phillips, Stacy: Served: 06/24/2021; Returned: 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan