Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/18/2018 at 08:03:01 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Randy W Hooper

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Randy W Hooper. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********83-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Hooper, Randy W

River Oaks, TX 76114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mildred Anaele

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • Dispositions: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Judgment - Agreed Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Rule 11 Agreement Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Citation: Hold for EZ Messenger; Hooper, Randy W: Served: 01/12/2018; Returned: 01/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-128763: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mildred Anaele