Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:00 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Nichole P Storm

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nichole P Storm. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********19-3

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Storm, Nichole P

Azle, TX 76020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elise D. Manchester

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2017
  • Dispositions: Order Dismissal Without Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Motion to Dismiss Doc ID#5: Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Citation: Hold for ABC Legal; Storm, Nichole P: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-119170: Discover Bank: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 253.00; Total Payments and Credits: 253.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise D. Manchester