This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/15/2023 at 16:05:08 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Marissa Kendrix

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marissa Kendrix. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9085

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Kendrix, Marissa

Haslet, TX 76052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketPre-Trial Hearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 03/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: EMAILED TO PLTF AND MAILED TO DEFN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 2.7.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2023-620: Discover Bank: (34.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 55.50; Total Payments and Credits: 55.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less