Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/17/2018 at 08:30:02 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. KAREN L GILMORE

Case Summary

On 07/03/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAREN L GILMORE. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5124

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

6500 New Albany Rd

New Albany, OH 43054

Defendant

GILMORE, KAREN L

Euless, TX 76039-5394

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cameron Seth White

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2018
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.) ; Judgment of $5,583.11; Awarded To: DISCOVER BANK; Awarded Against: KAREN GILMORE; Comment: JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, $5,583.11 + CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Default Notice Mailed: TO DEFN. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order Entered on Case: PLTF'S ATTY APPEARED; DEFN DID NOT APPEAR. CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS AND NON MILITARY PROVIDED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGMENT FOR PLTF, $5,583.11 + CC. COPY MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial: (10:45 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Agreed Judgment Filed: REC'D BY MAIL FROM PLTF'S ATTY. SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES. SAME JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 1/18/18. PLACED IN CASE FILE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2017
  • Trial letter mailed: TO PLTF'S ATTY AND DEFN. NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 1/18/18 @ 10:45AM IN SOUTHLAKE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Comments: PER JUDGE, TO BE ADDRESSED AT TIME OF TRIAL. SET FOR TRIAL. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Answer Filed: BY PRO SE DEFN. DEFN STATES SHE HAS MADE A PAYMENT ARRANGMENT WITH THE PLTF. PRESENTED TO JUDGE FOR POSSIBLE PRE TRIAL HEARING. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Letter Issued: TO DEFN. COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Process Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): FROM EZ MESSENGER/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Answer Due On: CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Citation Returned: DEFN SERVED IN PERSON ON 7-5-17 AT 10:10 AM BY EZ MESSENGER/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Defendant Contacted Court: VIA PHONE. STATING THAT SHE WAS SERVED AND HAS WORKED OUT A DEAL W/THE PLTF. ADVISED THAT SHE NEEDS TO FILE HER ANSWER (EXPLAINED PROCESS). KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Comments: BOB WITH EZ MESSENGER PICKED UP PAPERWORK. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Comments: CITN ISSUED AND PLACED IN EZ'S BIN FOR PICK UP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • CITATION: GILMORE, KAREN L: Served: 07/15/2017; Returned: 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): (SOUTHLAKE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-02774: RAUSCH, STURM, ISRAEL, ENERSON & HORNIK, LLC.: (41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cameron Seth White