This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/20/2021 at 10:04:47 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Erin Hall

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Erin Hall. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Brandt, William P. "Bill". The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6283

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Brandt, William P. "Bill"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Hall, Erin

Bedford, TX 76022-7136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Brandt, William P. "Bill") ; Judgment of $17,023.94; Awarded To: Discover Bank; Awarded Against: Erin Hall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Entered on Case: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR PLTF BY SUBMISSION IN THE AMOUNT OF $17,023.94 (INCLUDES CREDIT OF $530.98) + COURT COSTS @ 5% INT. COPIES SENT TO BOTH PARTIES/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF'S ATTY VIA EFILE. MOTION INCLUDES CERT OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS, MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND AFFIDAVIT OF RECORDS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComments: DEFN HAS DEFAULTED. COURT TO AWAIT PLTF'S ATTY TO REQUEST PROVE UP SETTING OR SUBMIT MOTION FOR DEFAULT/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: TO DEFN; COURT NOTIFIED OF SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 7/26/21 AT 7:08PM. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Hall, Erin: Served: 07/26/2021; Returned: 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-03266: Discover Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PLAINTIFF'S LAW FIRM: RAUSCH STURM MM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan