This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/27/2021 at 10:34:54 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Dwon L Dunning

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dwon L Dunning. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7080

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Dunning, Dwon L

Fort Worth, TX 76244-5160

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due: (8:30 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: LTR TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: ALTERNATE SERVICE ON 11/10/21 @ 6:18PM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Dunning, Dwon L: Served: 11/10/2021; Returned: 11/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY PPS. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. HM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Dunning, Dwon L: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-05017: Discover Bank: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): RAUSCH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery