Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/27/2021 at 08:17:41 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Doyce Kirkland

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Doyce Kirkland. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********41-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Kirkland, Doyce

North Richland, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Default signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Doyce Kirkland)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170990: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/5/2021; Kirkland, Doyce: Served: 04/13/2021; Returned: 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Mundt