Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/02/2021 at 08:14:47 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Donald G Korioth

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Donald G Korioth. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********56-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Korioth, Donald G

Fort Worth, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 6: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Default signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 5: Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171012: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/5/2021; Korioth, Donald G: Served: 06/12/2021; Returned: 06/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Mundt