This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/12/2017 at 15:35:49 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Cris L Crumholt

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cris L Crumholt. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********67-3

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Old Town Square, 1 Chisholm Trail, Suite 301

Round Rock, TX 78681

Defendant

Crumholt, Cris L

Mansfield, TX 76063

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elise Manchester

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2016
  • Defendant's Pro Se Answer Copy Pltf Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Citation: held for ABC LEGAL; Crumholt, Cris L: Served: 10/08/2016; Returned: 10/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#8:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Order for Rule 106 Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6: Citations Returned Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Motion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Citation: placed in ABC Legal basket; Crumholt, Cris L: Returned Unserved 09/13/2016; Returned: 09/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-114518: Discover Bank: (6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-112512: Discover Bank: (2.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-103686: Discover Bank: (255.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 263.00; Total Payments and Credits: 263.00; Balance Due as of 03/12/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elise D. Manchester