This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/22/2023 at 22:01:20 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Coryna Watson

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Coryna Watson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8133

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Watson, Coryna

Fort Worth, TX 76110-7432

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Charbonnet, Jason M)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2023-00808: Discover Bank: (34.50)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 55.50; Total Payments and Credits: 55.50; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 55.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCITATION: Watson, Coryna: Served: 02/09/2023: Response Received: 02/23/2023; Returned: 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less