Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/12/2021 at 09:10:17 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Alisa M O'Neal

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alisa M O'Neal. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********37-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

O'Neal, Alisa M

Haslet, TX 76052

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 7: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170981: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCitation: Picked up 4/5/2021; O'Neal, Alisa M: Served: 04/08/2021; Returned: 04/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Mundt