This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:21:08 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Ali Shafikhani

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ali Shafikhani. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********06-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Shafikhani, Ali

Arlington, TX 76017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Jonathan Mundt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 7: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Ali Shafikhani)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170259: Discover Bank: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Discover Bank; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for abc legal - picked up 03/04; Shafikhani, Ali: Served: 03/06/2021; Returned: 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant