This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/19/2022 at 08:03:24 (UTC).

Diego Huerta and Anthony Cook vs Demeta Jo Hawkins

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Diego Huerta and Anthony Cook filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Demeta Jo Hawkins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********51-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cook, Anthony

Huerta, Diego

Defendant

Hawkins, Demeta Jo

Fort Worth, TX 76134

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Demeta Jo Hawkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181659: Huerta, Diego: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Huerta, Diego; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Pick-up; Hawkins, Demeta Jo: Served: 05/12/2022; Returned: 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin