Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/22/2017 at 16:30:27 (UTC).

DEXTER JOHNSON vs. BOOKER JEFFERY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 DEXTER JOHNSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOOKER JEFFERY. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LEON, SERGIO L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6120

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 5

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

DE LEON, SERGIO L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, DEXTER

Forest Hill, TX 76104

Defendant

JEFFERY, BOOKER

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • Dispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: DE LEON, SERGIO L) ; Judgment; Awarded To: DEXTER JOHNSON; Awarded Against: BOOKER JEFFERY; Comment: POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION: JEFFERY, BOOKER: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Writ of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Writ of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Statement of Inability in Lieu of Filing Fees Filed: FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Bond for Appeal Set: AT $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is: $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Evict-Judgment for Plaintiff for Possesssion Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Hearing: (9:30 AM) () : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • EVICTION: 070617 ALIAS CITN RETD/EXECUTED 070517/BY ALTERNATE SERVICE/ATTACHED/MAILED/SET FOR TRIAL (071217 @ 9:30AM); JEFFERY, BOOKER: Served: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Request For Alternate Service Filed and Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • EVICTION: CITN RETD/REQUEST FOR ALTERNATE SERVICE; JEFFERY, BOOKER: Returned Unserved 07/03/2017; Returned: 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP5-2017-01546: JOHNSON, DEXTER: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff JOHNSON, DEXTER; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less