This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 13:07:30 (UTC).

DERRICK BRYANT AND LAWRENCE BRYANT vs. DAPPER SOCIAL AND CHARITY CLUB

Case Summary

On 07/06/2015 DERRICK BRYANT AND LAWRENCE BRYANT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAPPER SOCIAL AND CHARITY CLUB. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8377

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRYANT, DERRICK

BRYANT, LAWRENCE

Defendant

DAPPER SOCIAL AND CHARITY CLUB

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment; Awarded To: DAPPER SOCIAL AND CHARITY CLUB; Awarded Against: DERRICK BRYANT, et al

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketComments: Judgment for Defendant Ptlf take nothing. Copies mld to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketComments: Ptlf and Defn appeared for court. kn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketHearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketLetter Issued: COURT DATE 10/19/2015 @ 10:00 AM; MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES..KJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketAnswer Filed: BY DEFENDANT..KJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketCertificate of Service Filed: ..KJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketComments: CITATION RETURNED ON 07/09/2015 AND EXECUTED ON 07/08/2015 BY C08..KJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketAnswer Due On: ..KJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketCITATION: DAPPER SOCIAL AND CHARITY CLUB: Served: 07/08/2015; Returned: 07/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): CITATION PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-02266: BRYANT, DERRICK: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 75.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff BRYANT, DERRICK; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less