This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/26/2021 at 08:11:19 (UTC).

Dennise Pinon vs Mark Joseph Traganos

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Dennise Pinon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mark Joseph Traganos. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********02-2

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pinon, Dennise

Defendant

Traganos, Mark Joseph

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Rule 106 signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMotion Rule 106 w/Diligent Attempt Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-174329: Pinon, Dennise: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Pick-Up 07/20/2021/ 7/20/2021 p/u; Traganos, Mark Joseph: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 4: Request for Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-174091: Pinon, Dennise: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Pinon, Dennise; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin