This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/30/2019 at 07:31:12 (UTC).

DCP EAST PARK ROW DR, LLC vs. MIRELA SERDARU

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DCP EAST PARK ROW DR, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIRELA SERDARU. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5136

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DCP EAST PARK ROW DR, LLC

2405 E Park Row Dr

Arlington, TX 76010

Defendant

SERDARU, MIRELA

Arlington, TX 76010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • Dispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $1,416.60; Awarded To: DCP EAST PARK ROW DR, LLC; Awarded Against: MIRELA SERDARU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Vacate Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • During the Pendency of Appeal, the Interm Rent Due Is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Mailed default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • EVICTION: SERDARU, MIRELA: Served: 12/09/2019; Returned: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Citation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Military Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06128: DCP 2405 EAST PARK ROW DRIVE, LLC: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff DCP EAST PARK ROW DR, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.