This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/17/2022 at 08:36:06 (UTC).

David Jaime Rodriguez vs Fort Worth F&D Head Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 David Jaime Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Fort Worth F D Head Company, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********08-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, David Jaime

Defendants

Fort Worth F&D Head Company, Inc.

3040 E. Peden Road

Saginaw, TX 76179

a domestic corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kim R. Thorne

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas S. Bettinger

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177056: Rodriguez, David Jaime: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Rodriguez, David Jaime; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCitation: eserved to Attorney; Fort Worth F&D Head Company, Inc.: Served: 10/25/2021; Returned: 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A DOMESTIC CORP. B/S ITS REG. AGENT JEFF A WOOLEY AT, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim R. Thorne