This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/18/2021 at 10:33:54 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management Llc vs. Ron R Hill

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Crown Asset Management Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ron R Hill. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6848

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management Llc

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Hill, Ron R

Euless, TX 76040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Wade Stephens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComments: 90 DAYS WITH NO ACTIVITY. CASE TO BE SET FOR DWOP/CL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketLetter Issued: LTR TO DFNT, COURT INFORMED OF SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED IN PERSON ON 09/17/2021 @ 12:36PM BY ABC LEGAL. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Hill, Ron R: Served: 09/17/2021; Returned: 09/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO ABC LEGAL FOR SERVICE. MM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2021-04447: Crown Asset Management Llc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management Llc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SCOTT & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens