Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/31/2021 at 04:30:18 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank (Paypal) vs. Elishia Spriggins

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Paypal filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elishia Spriggins. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7562

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank (Paypal)

3100 Breckinridge Blvd Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

Spriggins, Elishia

Fort Worth, TX 76161-5332

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Option Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Spriggins, Elishia: Returned Unserved 03/08/2021; Returned: 03/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01156: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank (Paypal): (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Synchrony Bank (Paypal); Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan