This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 01/03/2022 at 08:54:24 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. vs Stephen Selmn

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Stephen Selmn. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********44-2

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc.

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendants

or at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Selmn, Stephen

Bedford, TX 76021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TaLisa Karene Lowery

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRule 239a Notice of Default Judgment Index # 10: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Default Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Default Judg. signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default W/Supporting Affidavits Index # 8: Default Judgment Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 7: Letter Requesting Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171703: Crown Asset Management, LLC: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC LEGAL-picked up 4/28/2021; Selmn, Stephen: Served: 05/15/2021; Returned: 05/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TaLisa Karene Lowery