This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 13:37:53 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. vs Moises Moreno Mejia

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Moises Moreno Mejia. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********92-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc.

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendants

or at such other place as the Defendant may be found

Mejia, Moises Moreno

Southlake, TX 76092

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Defendant Attorney

Pete Rowe

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171473: Crown Asset Management, LLC: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for ABC LEGAL -Picked up 4/21/2021; Mejia, Moises Moreno: Returned Unserved 07/12/2021; Returned: 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang