This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/15/2020 at 12:41:24 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. vs Keeli Bell

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Crown Asset Management, LLC assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Keeli Bell. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********21-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckenridge Blvd

Duluth, GA 30096

assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc.

3100 Breckenridge Blvd

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

Bell, Keeli

Fort Worth, TX 76133-4977

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Megan Hale

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketReturned Mail Index #9: Return to Sender Not Deliverable As Addressed Unable to Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #7: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #6: Re: Notice and Order of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-155818: Crown Asset Management, LLC: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation: EZ Messenger basket, .....QC by VS, 01-06-2020; Bell, Keeli: Returned Unserved 12/23/2019; Returned: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less