This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/02/2021 at 09:50:12 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc. vs Claressa Calderon

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Claressa Calderon. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********89-3

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd Suite 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc.

Defendants

Or wherever Defendant may be found

Calderon, Claressa

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Defendant Attorney

Dena Gayle Weaver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 9: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non Suit Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketChange of Address of Counsel Index # 6: RE: W/ Firm Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-165273: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer Usa Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCitation: ABC pickup; Calderon, Claressa: Served: 10/08/2020; Returned: 10/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Attorney Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where assignee of Santander Consumer USA Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dena Gayle Weaver