Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/25/2021 at 03:33:06 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc. vs. Bill Williams

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bill Williams. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8136

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc.

3100 Breckinridge Blvd Ste 725

Duluth, GA 30096

Defendant

Williams, Bill

Fort Worth, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colin Patrick Brogan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up/Option Letter Sent: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-02080: Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC Assignee Of Santander Consumer USA Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO ABCLEGAL//VA; Williams, Bill: Returned Unserved 04/22/2021; Returned: 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//VA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Patrick Brogan