Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 11/11/2017 at 08:07:15 (UTC).

CREST OASIS L.P. vs. GENARO CHICO,MARIA CHICO CORSON AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CREST OASIS L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GENARO CHICO,MARIA CHICO CORSON AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8874

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREST OASIS L.P.

Euless, TX 76040

Defendants

CHICO, GENARO

Ft. Worth, TX 76040

CHICO CORSON, MARIA

Ft. Worth, TX 76040

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice on Plaintiff's Motion: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED; MAILED TO ALL PARTIES; REMOVED FROM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Motion To Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff: BY FAX; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED BY ATTACHING TO DOOR BY RULE 510 ON 10/18/17 @ 8:08 AM TO MARIA CHICO CORSON AT 4933 OASIS CT #1907 FORT WORTH TX 76040 PER C03 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Citation Returned: SERVED BY ATTACHING TO DOOR BY RULE 510 ON 10/18/17 @ 8:08 AM TO GENARO CHICO AT 4933 OASIS CT #1907 FORT WORTH, TX 76040 PER C03 ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Order Approving Alternate Service Entered: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED; RETURNED TO C03 FOR SRVC ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Affidavit for Alternate Service Filed: BY BOTH DEFNS BY C03 FOR SRVC BY RULE 510; PRESENTED TO JUDGE ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • EVICTION: CHICO, GENARO: Served: 10/18/2017; Returned: 10/18/2017; CHICO CORSON, MARIA: Served: 10/18/2017; Returned: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Citation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed: ES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): HURST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-04474: REBECCA MILBRETT: (196.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff CREST OASIS L.P.; Total Financial Assessment: 196.00; Total Payments and Credits: 196.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 196.00

    Read MoreRead Less