This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:09:32 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs. TANISHA HILL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TANISHA HILL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0152

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendant

HILL, TANISHA

Grand Prairie, TX 75050

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alex Anshul Munjal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: ON FEBRUARY 19, 2020, CITATION RETURNED UNEXECUTED, BAD ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCitation Returned Unexecuted - Bad Address for Party:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06134: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: HILL, TANISHA: Returned Unserved 02/19/2020; Returned: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less