This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/08/2021 at 22:32:09 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs. RIHO BREIMAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIHO BREIMAN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 7 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************4240

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

BREIMAN, RIHO

Arlington, TX 76014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Wade Stephens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCITATION: BREIMAN, RIHO: Served: 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP7-2021-07174: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: mjscourts@abclegal.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Corp Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens