This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/13/2022 at 13:30:33 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs. LEIGH CROWELL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEIGH CROWELL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7251

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.

1120 Metrocrest Drive Suite 100

Carrollton, TX 75006

Defendant

CROWELL, LEIGH

Azle, TX 76020

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : 09/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: served on 5/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEmailed: REGARDING UNDELIVERABLE EMAILS TO PPS - PROOFSERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO SCOTTASSOCIATESFILINGS@PROOFSERVE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-2285: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Corp Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper