This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/14/2021 at 04:33:10 (UTC).

Credit Corp Solutions Inc. vs. Freddy Noriega

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Credit Corp Solutions Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Freddy Noriega. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************9028

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Corp Solutions Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Noriega, Freddy

Haltom City, TX 76117

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: KAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PPS//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: METHODS 1 & 2/EMAIL TO PPS//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: FIRST REQ.//EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Noriega, Freddy: Served: 08/27/2021; Returned: 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-03612: Credit Corp Solutions Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Credit Corp Solutions Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Corp Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper