This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/19/2020 at 23:58:42 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. vs. DAMIEL CHEATAM

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAMIEL CHEATAM. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0155

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendant

CHEATAM, DAMIEL

Arlington, TX 76006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Pre-Trial Hearing; (1:00 PM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom) ; Judgment of $7,387.29; Awarded To: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.; Awarded Against: DAMIEL CHEATAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEmailed: AGREED TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: FOR PLTF $7387.29 PLUS CC & INT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06134: ABC LEGAL SERVICES, LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCITATION: CHEATAM, DAMIEL: Served: 12/27/2019; Returned: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less