Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 10:30:36 (UTC).

Cowtown Gear, Inc. vs Randy Walker, Individually and d/b/a RFW Express a/k/a Randy Walker Trucking, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Cowtown Gear, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Randy Walker, Individually and d/b/a RFW Express a/k/a Randy Walker Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********39-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cowtown Gear, Inc.

2651 Warfield Street

Fort Worth, TX 76106

Defendant

Walker, Randy

Fort Worth, TX 76118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Heath Coffman

Defendant Attorney

Daniel B Smith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index #6: Emailed to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Agreed Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-163262: Cowtown Gear, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cowtown Gear, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney Office 07/24/2020; Walker, Randy: Served: 08/08/2020; Returned: 08/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B Smith