This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 10:41:32 (UTC).

Courtney Nash vs ATC MF No. 3, LP, & Hillwood Multifamily, L.P.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 Courtney Nash filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATC MF No 3, LP, Hillwood Multifamily, L P. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********36-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nash, Courtney

Defendants

ATC MF No. 3, LP

3000 Turtle Creek Blvd

Dallas, TX 75219

a domestic corporation

or wherever it may be found

b/s registered agent, Stephen D. Parker

Hillwood Multifamily, L.P.

Dallas, TX 75219

Hillwood Alliance Services LLC

3000 Turtle Creek Blvd

Dallas, TX 75219

b/s Registered Agent, Stephen D Parker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Sercely

SHAUNA J WRIGHT

Jeffrey Monroe Tillman, JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 10: (Hillwood Alliance Services LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's First Amended Petition Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDesignation of Expert Witness Index # 8: for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Business Records Index # 7: Affidavit (Medical & Billing Records - Multiple Provider)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 6: (Hillwood Multifamily LP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 5: (ATC MF No 3 LP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 4: Defendants' Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-179640: Nash, Courtney: (229.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Nash, Courtney; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 2/7/2022; ATC MF No. 3, LP: Served: 02/16/2022; Returned: 03/05/2022; Hillwood Multifamily, L.P.: Served: 02/16/2022; Returned: 04/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A DOMESTIC CORP. B/S ITS REG. AGENT JEFF A WOOLEY AT, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Sercely