Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 09:12:46 (UTC).

Cooper Supply, Inc. vs WB Supply LLC d/b/a WBS Supply LLC

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Cooper Supply, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WB Supply LLC d/b/a WBS Supply LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********31-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cooper Supply, Inc.

2524 Minnis Drive

Haltom City, TX 76117

Defendants

WB Supply LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

b/s its Registered Agent, Corporation Service Co.

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyler A. Harden

Defendant Attorney

Julie L. Griffis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-169606: Cooper Supply, Inc.: (371.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Cooper Supply, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 371.00; Total Payments and Credits: 371.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 371.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCitation: Sent by Certified Mail 02/10; WB Supply LLC: Served: 02/22/2021; Returned: 03/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WB Supply LLC is a litigant