Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/26/2019 at 10:16:35 (UTC).

CONNIE K. BAKER AND JETTA P. BAKER vs NENCY ARECHAR

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CONNIE K BAKER AND JETTA P BAKER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NENCY ARECHAR. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********60-3

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKER, CONNIE K.

Fort Worth, TX 76133

BAKER, JETTA P.

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Defendant

ARECHAR, NENCY

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adrian Baca

Defendant Attorney

Colin R. Hatcher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Week of Jury Trial Scheduling Only (Disregard Start Time): (7:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerHrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CANCELED: Jury Trial; (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerHrabal, Mike) ; Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Order to Continue Doc ID#47: eServed to both attys 8/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Motion to Continue Doc ID#46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Letter Doc ID#45: Re: Trial Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Order Setting Trial Doc ID#44: Copy electronically served and/or mailed to party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CANCELED: Jury Trial; (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerHrabal, Mike) ; Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Order to Continue Doc ID#43: eServed to both attys 5/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Motion to Continue - Agreed Doc ID#42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Vacation Letter Doc ID#41

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Citation: Mailed to Attorney; ARECHAR, NENCY: Served: 01/06/2018; Returned: 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-128739: BAKER, CONNIE K.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff BAKER, CONNIE K.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-129805: ARECHAR, NENCY: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Financial Information: Defendant ARECHAR, NENCY; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin R. Hatcher