This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 09/26/2021 at 01:17:29 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Tyresha Wallace

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tyresha Wallace. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************8471

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Wallace, Tyresha

Fort Worth, TX 76111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Wade Stephens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCANCELED: Prove Up Hearings; (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MAILED TO DEFN//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $2,406.18; Awarded To: Conn Appliances Inc.; Awarded Against: Tyresha Wallace

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Granted: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: BY PLTF ATTY/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketEmailed: NTC OF ZOOM PROVE UP HEARING TO PLTF ATTY/10.29.2021 10AM/JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Prove Up Hearing: JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Retain Granted: GRANT 60 DAYS//SET CASE FOR PROVE UP AFTER 10.25.21//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMotion to Retain Filed: W/SETTING REQUEST//FIRST REQ.//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//SERVD VIA ALT SERV//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: EFILED//BOTH METHODS APPROVED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: FIRST REQ.//EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-02635: Conn Appliances Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAILED TO ABCLEGAL//VA; Wallace, Tyresha: Served: 06/18/2021; Returned: 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//VA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com //MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens