This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 19:30:33 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Sergio Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sergio Rodriguez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6350

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Rodriguez, Sergio

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Charbonnet, Jason M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice: Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNotice: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-08562: Conn Appliances Inc.: (48.75)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 48.75; Total Payments and Credits: 48.75; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 48.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Rodriguez, Sergio: Served: 12/04/2021; Returned: 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant