This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/29/2020 at 08:20:41 (UTC).

CONN APPLIANCES INC vs. SCOTT BOYLES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CONN APPLIANCES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTT BOYLES. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0119

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONN APPLIANCES INC

Defendant

BOYLES, SCOTT

Arlington, TX 76016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mathew Phillip Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:00 AM) ()

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEmailed: LOP TO PLTF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: SEE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow up/ Answer Due; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: TO REPLACE LOST CITATION PER AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit/Letter of Lost Citation Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMilitary Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCITATION: BOYLES, SCOTT: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP2-2019-06130: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff CONN APPLIANCES INC; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less