This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 12/31/2021 at 13:32:00 (UTC).

Conn Appliances Inc. vs. Norma Perez

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Conn Appliances Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Norma Perez. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************6180

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances Inc.

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Perez, Norma

Fort Worth, TX 76135

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : answer due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned: srv'd on 12/03/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDefendant Contacted Court: BY PHONE / STATED THAT SHE WAS SERVED AND WASN'T SURE WHAT TO DO NEXT / REFERRED DEFN TO THE CITATION - NOTICE TO DEFN / DEFN STATED THAT SHE ONLY HAD ONE PAGE OF THE CIT ALONG WITH VULNERABLE POPULATION / EMAILED COPY OF CIT AND ANSWER FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Perez, Norma: Served: 12/03/2021; Returned: 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued: EMAILED TO MJSCOURTS@ABCLEGAL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-6478: Conn Appliances Inc.: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper