This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/10/2022 at 04:30:42 (UTC).

Conn Appliances, Inc. vs. Keisha Fantroy

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Conn Appliances, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Keisha Fantroy. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0789

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conn Appliances, Inc.

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant

Fantroy, Keisha

N Richlnd Hls, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet B. Turay

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit With Prejudice Entered: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE/EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00358: Conn Appliances, Inc.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Conn Appliances, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCITATION: CTN ISSUED TO ABC LEGAL// NO; Fantroy, Keisha: Served: 01/24/2022; Returned: 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EILED// EMAIL TO: javitchcourts@abclegal.com// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conn Appliances Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet B Turay